This case was last updated from Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court on 07/14/2020 at 16:08:11 (UTC).

ESTATE OF CAROLYN BATES VS CAPITAL PREFERRED INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 ESTATE OF CAROLYN BATES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CAPITAL PREFERRED INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court , Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEAGLE, MARK E and FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEAGLE, MARK E

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTATE OF CAROLYN BATES

Defendant

CAPITAL PREFERRED INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAVER, GLENN FREDERICK

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/04/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

03/04/2020:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CAPITAL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. FKA SOUTHERN FIDELITY PROPERTY AND CASUALTY, INC.

03/04/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO CAPITAL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. FKA SOUTHERN FIDELITY PROPERTY AND CASUALTY, INC.

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/04/2020:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/04/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/04/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES AND REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

03/04/2020:DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES AND REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE

03/04/2020:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE

RETURN OF SERVICE- CAPITAL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. FKA SOUTHERN FIDELITY PROPERTY AND CASUALTY, INC. C/O FLORIDA CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER SERVED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 03-06-20

03/10/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE- CAPITAL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. FKA SOUTHERN FIDELITY PROPERTY AND CASUALTY, INC. C/O FLORIDA CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER SERVED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 03-06-20

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

03/10/2020:NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF(S) DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- CAPITAL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. FKA SOUTHERN FIDELITY PROPERTY AND CASUALTY, INC. C/O FLORIDA CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER SERVED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 03-06-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketJudge: FEAGLE , MARK E Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES AND REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO CAPITAL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. FKA SOUTHERN FIDELITY PROPERTY AND CASUALTY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number CC 167082

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCase 122020CA000067CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/3/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gaver, Glenn Frederick