Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 01/09/2021 at 15:06:00 (UTC).

DOVE, MICHAEL RALPH II VS DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE CHILD SU Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 DOVE, MICHAEL RALPH II filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE CHILD SU. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DOVE, MICHAEL RALPH II

Respondents

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE CHILD SU

WILSON, CERISSA ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BUTLER, RACHEL CAROLINE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- SERVED: CERISSA ANN WILSON 12-29-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE-

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO STATE OF FLORIDA DOR CHILD SUPPORT PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO CERISSA ANN WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $320.00 Receipt Number CC 179903

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $320.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCase 122020DR000619DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUTLER, RACHEL CAROLINE