This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/13/2020 at 12:30:59 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS RANDALL, BERNICE E

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other lawsuit against RANDALL, BERNICE E. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

RANDALL, BERNICE E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLET, CHRISTINA N.

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR BERNICE RANDALL SERVED ON 02/04/2020 (SUB-MICHELE ROBERTS/CO-RESIDENT)

02/06/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR BERNICE RANDALL SERVED ON 02/04/2020 (SUB-MICHELE ROBERTS/CO-RESIDENT)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

01/31/2020:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

12/19/2019:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO BERNICE RANDALL

12/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO BERNICE RANDALL

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/19/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketANSWER OF BERNICE RANDALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- FOR BERNICE RANDALL SERVED ON 02/04/2020 (SUB-MICHELE ROBERTS/CO-RESIDENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketJudge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CC 162999

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO BERNICE RANDALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase 122019CC001698CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less