This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/08/2019 18:00:19

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by DISCOVER BANK against JOAN RHODES in the jurisdiction of Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Small Claim - Other Small Claim
  • Jurisdiction Columbia County Courts
  • Judge TOM COLEMAN
  • Courthouse Columbia County Courthouse
  • County Columbia
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Plaintiff DISCOVER BANK
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant JOAN RHODES
  • Represented By
    • LAVRAR, FLYNN

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOAN RHODES

06/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOAN RHODES

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • Event SMCL Pretrial scheduled on 9/18/2019 at 0900 AM, M1 - Judge TOM COLEMAN presiding.
  • 06/17/2019
  • Judge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned
  • 06/17/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CC 152453
  • 06/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOAN RHODES
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
  • 06/14/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case 122019SC000823SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2019
  • 09/18/2019
  • Event Date: 09/18/2019 09:00; Judge: COLEMAN, TOM; Docket Type: SMCL Pretrial; Location: M1 COURTROOM 1; Defendant Attorney: LAVRAR, FLYNN

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.