This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 12/20/2019 at 18:04:26 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS HARRIS, WILLIAM

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARRIS, WILLIAM. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TOM COLEMAN and COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TOM COLEMAN

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

HARRIS, WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLET, CHRISTINA N.

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/09/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/09/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR WILLIAM HARRIS

12/09/2019:SUMMONS FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR WILLIAM HARRIS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • Event SMCL Pretrial scheduled on 2/19/2020 at 0900 AM, M1 - Judge TOM COLEMAN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Judge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR WILLIAM HARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CC 162296

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Case 122019SC001632SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/19/2020 09:00; Judge: COLEMAN, TOM; Docket Type: SMCL Pretrial; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTROOM 1 COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.