This case was last updated from Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court on 07/14/2020 at 15:35:31 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS BUEHLER, SHERYLLE Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BUEHLER, SHERYLLE. This case was filed in Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court , Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND and DOUGLAS, WESLEY R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendants

DANELLA, KRISTEN

BUEHLER, SHERYLLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

Defendant Attorney

SNYDER, TIMOTHY H

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/06/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED TO KRISTEN DANELLA

02/06/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO KRISTEN DANELLA

SUMMONS ISSUED TO SHERYLLE BUEHLER

02/06/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO SHERYLLE BUEHLER

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

02/06/2020:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

COMPLAINT

02/06/2020:COMPLAINT

RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR KRISTEN DANELLA ON 2/17/2020 IND.

02/18/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR KRISTEN DANELLA ON 2/17/2020 IND.

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES, AND DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

02/25/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES, AND DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

DEFENDANT, KRISTEN DANELLA'S MOTION TO DISMISS

02/25/2020:DEFENDANT, KRISTEN DANELLA'S MOTION TO DISMISS

DEFENDANT, SHERYLLE BUEHLER'S MOTION TO DISMISS

02/27/2020:DEFENDANT, SHERYLLE BUEHLER'S MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES, AND DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

02/27/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES, AND DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE- SHERYLLE BUEHLER SERVED 02-26-20 (SUB-KRISTEN DANELLA)

03/06/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE- SHERYLLE BUEHLER SERVED 02-26-20 (SUB-KRISTEN DANELLA)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- SHERYLLE BUEHLER SERVED 02-26-20 (SUB-KRISTEN DANELLA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES, AND DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, SHERYLLE BUEHLER'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, KRISTEN DANELLA'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES, AND DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- FOR KRISTEN DANELLA ON 2/17/2020 IND.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketJudge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO SHERYLLE BUEHLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO KRISTEN DANELLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number CC 165496

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCase 122020CA000031CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/6/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daley, Sarah C