This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 11/28/2019 at 15:00:51 (UTC).

CREECH, JENIFER JUANITA VS CREECH, DAVID MICHEAL

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 CREECH, JENIFER JUANITA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CREECH, DAVID MICHEAL. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEAGLE, MARK E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEAGLE, MARK E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CREECH, JENIFER JUANITA

Respondent

CREECH, DAVID MICHEAL

Not Classified By Court

KELLY, JENIFER JUANITA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- DAVID CREECH SERVED 11/13/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DAVID CREECH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketBASIC PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketJudge: FEAGLE , MARK E Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCase 122019DR000718DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less