This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 12:06:43 (UTC).

COLLINS, CURTIS VS COLLINS, WENDY

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 COLLINS, CURTIS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COLLINS, WENDY. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEAGLE, MARK E, MARK FEAGLE and FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEAGLE, MARK E

MARK FEAGLE

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

 

Party Details

Petitioners

COLLINS, CURTIS

COLLINS, CURTIS DEWAYNE

Respondents

COLLINS, WENDY

COLLINS, WENDY REGINA

Not Classified By Court

KIRBY, WENDY REGINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketEvent FH scheduled on 1/14/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE WENDY COLLINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE CURTIS COLLINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO SET FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER WENDY COLLINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDISCLOSURE FROM NON LAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number CC 162217

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 122019DR000785DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: FEAGLE , MARK E assigned

    Read MoreRead Less