This case was last updated from Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court on 08/08/2022 at 20:06:50 (UTC).

COLLINS, CLEVELAND VS DOUGLAS, WILLIAM BENJAMIN

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 COLLINS, CLEVELAND filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DOUGLAS, WILLIAM BENJAMIN. This case was filed in Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court , Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND and DOUGLAS, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MURPHY, AS PARENT AND GUARDIAN

COLLINS, AS PARENT AND NATURAL

Defendant

DOUGLAS, WILLIAM BENJAMIN

Not Classified By Court

COLLINS, CLEVELAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorney

BARROW, JACOB BENNETT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/15/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/15/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAM DOUGLAS(UNEXECUTED-SUMMONS ISSUANCE FEE NOT PROVIDED)

07/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAM DOUGLAS(UNEXECUTED-SUMMONS ISSUANCE FEE NOT PROVIDED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

07/15/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

CERTIFICATE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT WILLIAM DOUGLAS

07/15/2022:CERTIFICATE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT WILLIAM DOUGLAS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT WILLIAM DOUGLAS

07/15/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT WILLIAM DOUGLAS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT WILLIAM DOUGLAS

07/15/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT WILLIAM DOUGLAS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAM DOUGLAS

07/20/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAM DOUGLAS

AMENDED COMPLAINT

07/29/2022:AMENDED COMPLAINT

AMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT WILLIAM DOUGLAS

07/29/2022:AMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT WILLIAM DOUGLAS

RETURN OF SERVICE-WILLIAM DOUGLAS SERVED 07/29/22 (INDV)

08/08/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE-WILLIAM DOUGLAS SERVED 07/29/22 (INDV)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE-WILLIAM DOUGLAS SERVED 07/29/22 (INDV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT WILLIAM DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAM DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number CC 212388

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketJudge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT WILLIAM DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT WILLIAM DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT WILLIAM DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAM DOUGLAS(UNEXECUTED-SUMMONS ISSUANCE FEE NOT PROVIDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number CC 212173

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCase 122022CA000231CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/15/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Murphy, as he is the Chapter 7 Trustee of Pagliaro is a litigant

Latest cases where Collins is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARROW , JACOB BENNETT