This case was last updated from Columbia County Florida Courts on 05/21/2022 at 22:06:45 (UTC).

CHAPMAN, HEATHER VS CHAVARRIA, PAULINE

Case Summary

On 04/27/2022 CHAPMAN, HEATHER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHAVARRIA, PAULINE. This case was filed in Columbia County Florida Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CARTER, SARA JANE and CARTER, SARA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CARTER, SARA JANE

CARTER, SARA J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAPMAN, HEATHER

Defendant

CHAVARRIA, PAULINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLER, THOMAS RAY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/27/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

EVICTION COMPLAINT AND OTHER RELIEF (ATTACHED LETTER)

04/27/2022:EVICTION COMPLAINT AND OTHER RELIEF (ATTACHED LETTER)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PAULINE CHAVARRIA

04/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO PAULINE CHAVARRIA

RETURN OF SERVICE-PAULINE CHAVARRIA SERVED 05/10/22(SUB-DANIEL CORONA)

05/11/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE-PAULINE CHAVARRIA SERVED 05/10/22(SUB-DANIEL CORONA)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY OCCUPANT OTHER THAN NAMED DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE-PAULINE CHAVARRIA SERVED 05/10/22(SUB-DANIEL CORONA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketJudge: CARTER , SARA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $197.00 Receipt Number CC 207521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $197.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PAULINE CHAVARRIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION COMPLAINT AND OTHER RELIEF (ATTACHED LETTER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $197.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCase 122022CC000426CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLER, THOMAS RAY