This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/18/2019 at 22:01:39 (UTC).

CENTURY 21 THE DARBY-ROGERS CO VS COLLINS, CLEVLAND Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 CENTURY 21 THE DARBY-ROGERS CO filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against COLLINS, CLEVLAND. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTURY 21 THE DARBY-ROGERS CO

Defendants

MURPHY, TIFFANY

COLLINS, CLEVLAND

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION SERVED

07/11/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION SERVED

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

07/03/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION AND RESERVATION OF JURISDICTION

07/03/2019:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION AND RESERVATION OF JURISDICTION

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION

07/02/2019:MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST CLEVLAND COLLINS AND TIFFANY MURPHY

07/02/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST CLEVLAND COLLINS AND TIFFANY MURPHY

RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR CLEVLAND COLLINS AND TIFFANY MURPHY

06/25/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR CLEVLAND COLLINS AND TIFFANY MURPHY

RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

06/24/2019:RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CLEVLAND COLLINS AND TIFFANY MURPHY

06/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO CLEVLAND COLLINS AND TIFFANY MURPHY

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION AND RESERVATION OF JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • EMAILED PROPOSED DFJ TO JUDGES OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST CLEVLAND COLLINS AND TIFFANY MURPHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR CLEVLAND COLLINS AND TIFFANY MURPHY ON 6/24/19 (POSTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number CC 152933

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CLEVLAND COLLINS AND TIFFANY MURPHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION WITH ATTACHED LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • INITIAL NOTICE (3DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Case 122019CC000861CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Judge: COLEMAN , TOM assigned

    Read MoreRead Less