This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 12/02/2019 at 22:01:22 (UTC).

CASCADE CAPITAL LLC ASSIGNEE O VS COURTNEY, DIANNA

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 CASCADE CAPITAL LLC ASSIGNEE O filed an Other lawsuit against COURTNEY, DIANNA. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASCADE CAPITAL LLC ASSIGNEE O

Defendant

COURTNEY, DIANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE- DIANNA COURTNEY SERVED 11/15/2019 (SUB-JOHN COURTNEY/PARENT)

11/16/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE- DIANNA COURTNEY SERVED 11/15/2019 (SUB-JOHN COURTNEY/PARENT)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DIANNA COURTNEY

11/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO DIANNA COURTNEY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/08/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- DIANNA COURTNEY SERVED 11/15/2019 (SUB-JOHN COURTNEY/PARENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketJudge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DIANNA COURTNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CC 160634

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCase 122019CC001485CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less