This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 14:34:51 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS LASSETER, JAMIE W

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LASSETER, JAMIE W. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TOM COLEMAN and COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TOM COLEMAN

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

Defendant

LASSETER, JAMIE W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUIR, DANIELA SOLORZANO

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

05/12/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR JAIME W LASSETER SERVED ON 01/09/2020 (IND)

02/10/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR JAIME W LASSETER SERVED ON 01/09/2020 (IND)

NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

12/19/2019:NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

SUMMONS TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR JAMIE W LASSETER

12/19/2019:SUMMONS TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR JAMIE W LASSETER

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/04/2020 10:00; Judge: COLEMAN, TOM; Docket Type: SMCL Pretrial; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTROOM 1 COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event SMCL Pretrial on 3/4/2020 1000 AM Judge TOM COLEMAN results SETTLED on 3/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND CONSENT TO JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketPRE TRIAL WORKSHEET-STIPULATION AND CONSENT TO JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- FOR JAIME W LASSETER SERVED ON 01/09/2020 (IND)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketJudge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR JAMIE W LASSETER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number CC 162879

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase 122019SC001683SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less