This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 12/12/2021 at 18:03:35 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS GALLAWAY, MARION

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GALLAWAY, MARION. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CARTER, SARA J, CARTER, SARA JANE and SARA CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CARTER, SARA J

CARTER, SARA JANE

SARA CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

GALLAWAY, MARION

Lake City, FL 32024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/18/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

11/18/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARION GALLAWAY

11/18/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARION GALLAWAY

RETURN OF NON SERVICE MARION GALLAWAY

12/08/2021:RETURN OF NON SERVICE MARION GALLAWAY

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/18/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/05/2022 09:00; Judge: CARTER, SARA J; Docket Type: SMCL Pretrial; Location: JUDGE'S CHAMBERS VIA ZO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF NON SERVICE MARION GALLAWAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketJudge: CARTER , SARA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent SMCL Pretrial scheduled on 1/5/2022 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge SARA CARTER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CC 198232

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUEDMARION GALLAWAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCase 122021SC001330SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel