This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/13/2020 at 12:30:15 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS COUTER, ALBERT

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed an Other lawsuit against COUTER, ALBERT. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

Defendant

COUTER, ALBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUIR, DANIELA SOLORZANO

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

03/12/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

02/11/2020:NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST ALBERT COUTER

02/11/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST ALBERT COUTER

RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR ALBERT COUTER ON 1/13/2020 IND.

01/28/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR ALBERT COUTER ON 1/13/2020 IND.

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

12/19/2019:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

12/19/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

COMPLAINT

12/19/2019:COMPLAINT

NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

12/19/2019:NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/19/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO ALBERT COUTER

12/19/2019:CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO ALBERT COUTER

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST ALBERT COUTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- FOR ALBERT COUTER ON 1/13/2020 IND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketJudge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ACTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO ALBERT COUTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CC 162910

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase 122019CC001688CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less