This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 08/01/2019 at 18:00:27 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS BROWN, CHAD D

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BROWN, CHAD D. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TOM COLEMAN and COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TOM COLEMAN

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

BROWN, CHAD D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUIR, DANIELA SOLORZANO

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

07/08/2019:DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

SUMMONS TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO CHAD D BROWN

07/08/2019:SUMMONS TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO CHAD D BROWN

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • Event SMCL Pretrial scheduled on 10/2/2019 at 0900 AM, M1 - Judge TOM COLEMAN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Judge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO CHAD D BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CC 153611

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Case 122019SC000911SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Event Date: 10/02/2019 09:00; Judge: COLEMAN, TOM; Docket Type: SMCL Pretrial; Location: M1 COURTROOM 1

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.