This case was last updated from Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court on 07/14/2020 at 13:16:48 (UTC).

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION VS SWANSON, NICHOLAS M

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against SWANSON, NICHOLAS M. This case was filed in Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court , Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYAN, PAUL S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRYAN, PAUL S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION

Defendant

SWANSON, NICHOLAS M

Not Classified By Court

SWANSON, NICHOLAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/27/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REPLEVIN FOR DAMAGES

12/27/2019:VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REPLEVIN FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS ISSUED TO NICHOLAS M SWANSON

12/27/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO NICHOLAS M SWANSON

EXPARTE MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING SHERIFF TO ENTER LOCKED PREMISES

12/27/2019:EXPARTE MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING SHERIFF TO ENTER LOCKED PREMISES

REPLEVIN BOND (original recvd 01-15-20)

12/27/2019:REPLEVIN BOND (original recvd 01-15-20)

RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

12/31/2019:RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

COVER LETTER TO CLERK

01/10/2020:COVER LETTER TO CLERK

ORDER REQUIRING SHERIFF TO ENTER LOCKED PREMISES

01/14/2020:ORDER REQUIRING SHERIFF TO ENTER LOCKED PREMISES

ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE A WRIT OF PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN AND FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY

01/14/2020:ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE A WRIT OF PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN AND FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY

COVER LETTER TO JUDGE BRYAN

01/14/2020:COVER LETTER TO JUDGE BRYAN

PRE-JUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN ISSUED

01/14/2020:PRE-JUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN ISSUED

ORIGINAL REPLEVIN BOND

01/15/2020:ORIGINAL REPLEVIN BOND

RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

01/15/2020:RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

RETURN OF SERVICE-NICHOLAS SWANSON SERVED 02-07-20 (INDV) (Summons & Verified Complaint)

02/10/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE-NICHOLAS SWANSON SERVED 02-07-20 (INDV) (Summons & Verified Complaint)

RETURN OF SERVICE-NICHOLAS SWANSON SERVED 02-07-20 (Writ of Replevin)

02/10/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE-NICHOLAS SWANSON SERVED 02-07-20 (Writ of Replevin)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT WITH ATTACHED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR THE RETURN OF THE REPLEVIN BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE-NICHOLAS SWANSON SERVED 02-07-20 (Writ of Replevin)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE-NICHOLAS SWANSON SERVED 02-07-20 (INDV) (Summons & Verified Complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $2.00 Receipt Number CC 164165

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 4 Total Assessed $2.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 4 assessed at sum $2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL REPLEVIN BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-JUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $8.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $485.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketJudge: BRYAN , PAUL S Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLEVIN BOND (original recvd 01-15-20)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING SHERIFF TO ENTER LOCKED PREMISES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO NICHOLAS M SWANSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REPLEVIN FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCase 122019CA000490CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION is a litigant