This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 10/01/2021 at 18:14:28 (UTC).

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION VS PUCCI, DOMINICK MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PUCCI, DOMINICK MICHAEL. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CARTER, SARA JANE, CARTER, SARA J and SARA CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CARTER, SARA JANE

CARTER, SARA J

SARA CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION

Defendant

PUCCI, DOMINICK MICHAEL

Lake City, FL 32024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REISS, JENNIFER L

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE- DOMINICK MICHAEL PUCCI SERVED 9/15/2021 (SUB-NICK PUCCI/PARENT)

09/15/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE- DOMINICK MICHAEL PUCCI SERVED 9/15/2021 (SUB-NICK PUCCI/PARENT)

PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED DOMINICK MICHAEL PUCCI

09/07/2021:PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED DOMINICK MICHAEL PUCCI

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/07/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/17/2021 09:00; Judge: CARTER, SARA J; Docket Type: SMCL Pretrial; Location: JUDGE'S CHAMBERS VIA ZO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- DOMINICK MICHAEL PUCCI SERVED 9/15/2021 (SUB-NICK PUCCI/PARENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEvent SMCL Pretrial scheduled on 11/17/2021 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge SARA CARTER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketJudge: CARTER , SARA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CC 194139

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED DOMINICK MICHAEL PUCCI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCase 122021SC001039SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISS JENNIFER L