This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/18/2019 at 22:03:46 (UTC).

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION VS FREEMAN, ROBERT ANTHONY

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION filed an Other lawsuit against FREEMAN, ROBERT ANTHONY. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION

Defendant

FREEMAN, ROBERT ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

REISS, JENNIFER L

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

07/17/2019:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

06/24/2019:DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • MOTION FOR CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • NOTE TO DOCKET: SUMMONS AND FEE WAS NOT PROVIDED TO THE CLERK FOR ISSUANCE BY MG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Judge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Payment received: $300.00 Receipt Number CC 152901

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Case 122019CC000859CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less