This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/19/2019 at 22:02:18 (UTC).

CALDWELL, JESSE VS JOHNSON, JAMEKA

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 CALDWELL, JESSE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JOHNSON, JAMEKA. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALDWELL, JESSE

Defendant

JOHNSON, JAMEKA

Not Classified By Court

CALDWELL, JESSE JR

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION SERVED

07/10/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION SERVED

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

07/03/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

EMAILED PROPOSED DFJ TO THE JUDGES OFFICE

07/03/2019:EMAILED PROPOSED DFJ TO THE JUDGES OFFICE

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION

07/03/2019:MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST JAMEKA JOHNSON

07/03/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST JAMEKA JOHNSON

ANSWER FROM JAMEKA JOHNSON

07/01/2019:ANSWER FROM JAMEKA JOHNSON

RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR JAMEKA JOHNSON ON 06/25/2019 IND

06/27/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR JAMEKA JOHNSON ON 06/25/2019 IND

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

06/25/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

INITIAL NOTICE (3DAY)

06/25/2019:INITIAL NOTICE (3DAY)

RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

06/25/2019:RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JAMEKA JOHNSON

06/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JAMEKA JOHNSON

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EMAILED PROPOSED DFJ TO THE JUDGES OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST JAMEKA JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FROM JAMEKA JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR JAMEKA JOHNSON ON 06/25/2019 IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO JAMEKA JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL NOTICE (3DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Case 122019CC000862CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Judge: COLEMAN , TOM assigned

    Read MoreRead Less