This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/16/2020 at 12:16:12 (UTC).

BULTHUIS, HOWARD JR, BULTHUIS, HOWARD SR Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 BULTHUIS, HOWARD JR, BULTHUIS, HOWARD SR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIN, MELISSA G and OLIN, MELISSA GATES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OLIN, MELISSA G

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BULTHUIS, HOWARD JR

Decedent

BULTHUIS, HOWARD SR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NORRIS, GUY W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketTRANSMITTAL LETTER FROM GENERAL MAGISTRATE TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (Original)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCOVER LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCOVER LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number CC 162939

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase 122019CP000329CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less