This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/15/2019 at 22:02:22 (UTC).

BROWNING, FREDDIE VS BROWN, MISSY Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 BROWNING, FREDDIE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BROWN, MISSY. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWNING, FREDDIE

Defendants

BROWN, MISSY

MITCHELL, WILLIAM III

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR MISSY BROWN AND WILLIAM MITCHELL III ON 06/25/2019 IND

06/27/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR MISSY BROWN AND WILLIAM MITCHELL III ON 06/25/2019 IND

RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

06/21/2019:RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MISSY BROWN AND WILLIAM MITCHELL, III

06/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MISSY BROWN AND WILLIAM MITCHELL, III

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR MISSY BROWN AND WILLIAM MITCHELL III ON 06/25/2019 IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number CC 152792

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO MISSY BROWN AND WILLIAM MITCHELL, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • INITIAL NOTICE (3 DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Case 122019CC000846CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Judge: COLEMAN , TOM assigned

    Read MoreRead Less