Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County on 11/26/2020 at 20:00:48 (UTC).

BROWN, JOSHUA M VS THREE RIVERS ESTATES PROPERTY

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 BROWN, JOSHUA M filed an Other lawsuit against THREE RIVERS ESTATES PROPERTY. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYAN, PAUL S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRYAN, PAUL S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN, JOSHUA M

Defendant

THREE RIVERS ESTATES PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMSEY, JONATHAN DAVID

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO THREE RIVERS ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS, INC.

11/23/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO THREE RIVERS ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO THREE RIVERS ESTATES PROPERTY OWNDERS, INC. C/O JOHN S. BRYANT (UNEXECUTED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT)

11/03/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO THREE RIVERS ESTATES PROPERTY OWNDERS, INC. C/O JOHN S. BRYANT (UNEXECUTED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/03/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO THREE RIVERS ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number CC 178705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketJudge: BRYAN , PAUL S Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO THREE RIVERS ESTATES PROPERTY OWNDERS, INC. C/O JOHN S. BRYANT (UNEXECUTED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number CC 177762

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCase 122020CA000265CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/2/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMSEY, JONATHAN D