This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 09/13/2021 at 03:48:54 (UTC).

BROWN, JEREMY J VS EDWARDS, EMILY K

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 BROWN, JEREMY J filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against EDWARDS, EMILY K. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD, MARK FEAGLE and FEAGLE, MARK E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

MARK FEAGLE

FEAGLE, MARK E

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BROWN, JEREMY J

BROWN, JEREMY JAMES

Respondents

EDWARDS, EMILY K

EDWARDS, EMILY KATHERINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DECKER, ANDREW JOSEPH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY AND PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- SERVED: EMILY EDWARDS 04-15-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE-ORDER ENTERING TEMPORARY PARENTING PLAN AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE SERVED:EMILY EDWARDS 04-15-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEvent STATUS CONFERENCE scheduled on 6/16/2021 at 0200 PM, JC - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketORDER ENTERING TEMPORARY PARENTING PLAN AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEvent NON JURY TRIAL scheduled on 4/14/2021 at 0200 PM, JC - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketJudge: FEAGLE , MARK E Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CC 180379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO EMILY KATHERINE EDWARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketEMERGENCY VERIFIED PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCase 122021DR000002DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/5/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DECKER, ANDREW JOSEPH