This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 10/27/2019 at 15:01:59 (UTC).

BROWN, CHRISTOPHER EDWARD VS BROWN, SHEA R

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 BROWN, CHRISTOPHER EDWARD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BROWN, SHEA R. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEAGLE, MARK E, WESLEY DOUGLAS and DOUGLAS, WESLEY R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEAGLE, MARK E

WESLEY DOUGLAS

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BROWN, CHRISTOPHER EDWARD

Respondent

BROWN, SHEA R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WITT, STEPHEN MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • ANSWER, WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • PETITIONER'S EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO PROPERTY OR DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Judge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF HEARING - per Mr. Witt's office, Judge Douglas agreed to hear this case due to time constraints

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • ANSWER, WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Judge: FEAGLE , MARK E Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number CC 158673

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Case 122019DR000640DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WITT, STEPHEN MICHAEL