This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/18/2019 at 14:30:33 (UTC).

BRODERSEN, TERRY, RICH, MARJORIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 BRODERSEN, TERRY, RICH, MARJORIE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is OLIN, MELISSA G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

OLIN, MELISSA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRODERSEN, TERRY

Decedent

RICH, MARJORIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROSENBLATT, HOWARD MARSHALL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • TRANSMITTAL LETTER FROM GENERAL MAGISTRATE TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • COVER LETTER TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • COVER LETTER TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND (BRYAN K RICH)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2019
  • LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT (RCV'D ORIGINAL 6-19-19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number CC 152921

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Case 122019CP000166CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less