This case was last updated from Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court on 07/14/2020 at 16:07:29 (UTC).

BOWERS, ALONZA VS COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COMMI Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 BOWERS, ALONZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COMMI. This case was filed in Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court , Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYAN, PAUL S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRYAN, PAUL S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOWERS, ALONZA

Defendants

WARNER, REVIS

COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COMMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIGGART, JAMES GARRETT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/25/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/25/2020:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO REVIS WARNER

02/25/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO REVIS WARNER

SUMMONS ISSUED TO COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS

02/25/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS

CERTIFICATE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT REVIS WARNER

02/25/2020:CERTIFICATE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT REVIS WARNER

CERTIFICATE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS

02/25/2020:CERTIFICATE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANTS

02/25/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANTS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANTS

02/25/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANTS

RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS ON 3/25/2020 (BEN SCOTT- COUNTY MANAGER- ACCEPTED SERVICE)

03/26/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS ON 3/25/2020 (BEN SCOTT- COUNTY MANAGER- ACCEPTED SERVICE)

RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR REVIS WARNER ON 3/25/2020 IND.

03/26/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR REVIS WARNER ON 3/25/2020 IND.

NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

04/22/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS' PRIVELEGE LOG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS RESPONSES TO PLANTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- FOR REVIS WARNER ON 3/25/2020 IND.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT REVIS WARNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO COLUMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO REVIS WARNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number CC 166483

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCase 122020CA000049CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/25/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLUMBIA COUNTY BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIGGART II ESQ, JAMES G