This case was last updated from Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court on 03/24/2019 at 15:01:48 (UTC).

BOWDEN, AKILAH S Et Al VS CITY OF LAKE CITY Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2018 BOWDEN, AKILAH S filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF LAKE CITY. This case was filed in Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court , Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DECKER, ANDREW J III, COOPER, JOHN C, FEAGLE, MARK E, JOHN COOPER, DECKER III, ANDREW J and DOUGLAS, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DECKER, ANDREW J III

COOPER, JOHN C

FEAGLE, MARK E

JOHN COOPER

DECKER III, ANDREW J

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PORTEE-JONES, LAKSIA L

GEORGE, LUCIOUS

WRIGHT, ROBERT

BOWDEN, ALDONIA F

DOUGLAS, CLYDE

CLARK, KIARA

WILLIAMS, KAMARIA

WHITTAKER, SHAIWONG

DIXON, CARLA

CARTER, MARY A

DOUGLAS, LAVERN

JONES, CLARA

GEORGE, WILLIAM H

JONES, TERRANCE

GEORGE, VANESSA

Defendants

WARD, GEORGE

CITY OF LAKE CITY

WITT, STEPHEN M

HILL, JAKE JR

COLUMBIA COUNTY CANVASSING BOA

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REEVES, GEORGE THOMAS

Defendant Attorneys

LOGAN, MEAGAN LINDSAY

FOREMAN, JOEL FLETCHER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/11/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/11/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

DEFENDANT CITY OF LAKE CITY'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES NUMBER 1 THROUGH 8

02/25/2019:DEFENDANT CITY OF LAKE CITY'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES NUMBER 1 THROUGH 8

RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANTS

02/25/2019:RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANTS

DEFENDANT CITY OF LAKE CITY'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/22/2019:DEFENDANT CITY OF LAKE CITY'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

OMNIBUS ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

02/12/2019:OMNIBUS ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

COVER LETTER

02/12/2019:COVER LETTER

NOTICE OF FILING (City Council Resolution 2018-100)

02/05/2019:NOTICE OF FILING (City Council Resolution 2018-100)

AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

02/05/2019:AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANTS

02/05/2019:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANTS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/13/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT CITY

01/13/2019:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT CITY

ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

01/08/2019:ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

01/08/2019:ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT

01/04/2019:ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT

ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION

12/12/2018:ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION

MEMORANDUM OF REASSIGNMENT

12/06/2018:MEMORANDUM OF REASSIGNMENT

ORDER OF RECUSAL

12/03/2018:ORDER OF RECUSAL

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' THIRD REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANT CITY COUNCIL OF THE CITY OF LAKE CITY, FLORIDA'S NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW AS TO COUNTS I AND II OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANT CITY COUNCIL OF THE CITY OF LAKE CITY, FLORIDA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW AS TO COUNTS I AND II OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANT CITY OF LAKE COTY'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT CITY OF LAKE CITY'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES NUMBER 1 THROUGH 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT CITY OF LAKE CITY'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 03/29/2019 10:00; Judge: COOPER, JOHN C; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: M1 MAIN COURTHOUSE; Defendant Attorney: LOGAN, MEAGAN LINDSAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 03/29/2019 10:00; Judge: COOPER, JOHN C; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: M1 MAIN COURTHOUSE; Defendant Attorney: FOREMAN, JOEL FLETCHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 03/29/2019 10:00; Judge: COOPER, JOHN C; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: M1 MAIN COURTHOUSE; Defendant Attorney: LOGAN, MEAGAN LINDSAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 02/04/2019 15:30; Judge: COOPER, JOHN C; Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: LE LEON CTY COURTHOUSE; Defendant Attorney: LOGAN, MEAGAN LINDSAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 02/04/2019 15:30; Judge: COOPER, JOHN C; Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: LE LEON CTY COURTHOUSE; Defendant Attorney: LOGAN, MEAGAN LINDSAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 02/04/2019 15:30; Judge: COOPER, JOHN C; Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: LE LEON CTY COURTHOUSE; Defendant Attorney: LOGAN, MEAGAN LINDSAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 02/04/2019 15:30; Judge: COOPER, JOHN C; Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: LE LEON CTY COURTHOUSE; Defendant Attorney: LOGAN, MEAGAN LINDSAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 02/04/2019 15:30; Judge: COOPER, JOHN C; Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: LE LEON CTY COURTHOUSE; Defendant Attorney: LOGAN, MEAGAN LINDSAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 02/04/2019 15:30; Judge: COOPER, JOHN C; Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: LE LEON CTY COURTHOUSE; Defendant Attorney: FOREMAN, JOEL FLETCHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 02/04/2019 15:30; Judge: COOPER, JOHN C; Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: LE LEON CTY COURTHOUSE; Defendant Attorney: LOGAN, MEAGAN LINDSAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less