This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 12:08:19 (UTC).

BORIS, MARK VS BORIS, POLLLYANN WORTHINGTON

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 BORIS, MARK filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BORIS, POLLLYANN WORTHINGTON. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEAGLE, MARK E, MARK FEAGLE and FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEAGLE, MARK E

MARK FEAGLE

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BORIS, MARK

Respondent

BORIS, POLLLYANN WORTHINGTON

Not Classified By Court

WORTHINGTON, POLLYANN BORIS

BORIS, MARK DAVID

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketAMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketEMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketEvent FH scheduled on 12/13/2019 at 1000 AM, JC - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number CC 162187

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: FEAGLE , MARK E Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 122019DR000784DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less