This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/15/2019 at 15:00:29 (UTC).

BOOTH, AMY NESHEA VS BOOTH, ROBERT PAUL

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 BOOTH, AMY NESHEA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BOOTH, ROBERT PAUL. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEAGLE, MARK E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEAGLE, MARK E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOOTH, AMY NESHEA

Respondent

BOOTH, ROBERT PAUL

Not Classified By Court

BOOTH, AMY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE-ROBERT BOOTH SERVED 6/26/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • BASIC PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBERT BOOTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Judge: FEAGLE , MARK E Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Case 122019DR000393DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less