This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County on 06/21/2021 at 10:30:30 (UTC).

BLEVINS, SHERRIE VS PEEK, JULIE R

Case Summary

On 06/20/1996 BLEVINS, SHERRIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PEEK, JULIE R. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS, E VERNON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/1996

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DOUGLAS, E VERNON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLEVINS, SHERRIE

Defendant

PEEK, JULIE R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEMAS, THOMAS THEODORE

 

Court Documents

EVIDENCE RECORD FORM

03/20/1997:EVIDENCE RECORD FORM

LETTER OF INTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCE MAILED TO CARL SCOTT SCHULER (ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT) ON 10/30/2018 BY: TN

10/30/2018:LETTER OF INTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCE MAILED TO CARL SCOTT SCHULER (ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT) ON 10/30/2018 BY: TN

LETTER OF INTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCE MAILED TO THOMAS T. DEMAS (ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF) ON 10/30/2018 BY: TN

10/30/2018:LETTER OF INTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCE MAILED TO THOMAS T. DEMAS (ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF) ON 10/30/2018 BY: TN

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER OF INTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCE MAILED TO CARL SCOTT SCHULER (ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT) ON 10/30/2018 BY: TN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER OF INTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCE MAILED TO THOMAS T. DEMAS (ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF) ON 10/30/2018 BY: TN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/1997
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/1997
  • DocketJUDGES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/1997
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/1997
  • DocketAFFDVT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/1997
  • DocketSUBPOENA DT FOR DEPO SERVED; ANNE ELSTON; 61097

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/1997
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING TELEPHONE DEPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/1997
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; 7297 3;30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/1997
  • DocketMOTION TO TAX COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/1996
  • DocketNOTICEOF SERVICE OF INTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/1996
  • DocketDFDNT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/1996
  • DocketANSWER OF JULIE PEEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/1996
  • DocketNOTICEOF INTERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/1996
  • DocketJULIE PEEK ALIAS SUMMONS SERVED 7996

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/1996
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED JULIE PEEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/1996
  • DocketJULIE PEEK SUMMONS NOT FOUND 62796

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/1996
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JULIE PEEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/1996
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/1996
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less