This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 12/01/2019 at 15:01:03 (UTC).

BLACKBURN, ANNE MARIE, BRETT, ANNE MARIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 BLACKBURN, ANNE MARIE, BRETT, ANNE MARIE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEAGLE, MARK E and MARK FEAGLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEAGLE, MARK E

MARK FEAGLE

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BRETT, ANNE MARIE

BRETT, CASEY ANN

Not Classified By Court

BLACKBURN, ANNE MARIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketEvent FH scheduled on 11/25/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE CASY BRETT AND ANNE BRETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER CASEY BRETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER ANNE BRETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketJudge: FEAGLE , MARK E Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number CC 160594

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCase 122019DR000730DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less