This case was last updated from Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court on 10/17/2022 at 20:02:32 (UTC).

BELL, CHEQUETTA VS CONNOR, COLE Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2022 BELL, CHEQUETTA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CONNOR, COLE. This case was filed in Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court , Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND and DOUGLAS, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELL, CHEQUETTA

Defendants

PIKE ELECTRIC LLC

CONNOR, COLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILBERT, RYAN LARRY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/23/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/23/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

09/23/2022:NOTICE OF FILING THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PIKE ELECTRIC, LLC

09/23/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO PIKE ELECTRIC, LLC

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES (TO PIKE ELECTRIC, LLC)

09/23/2022:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES (TO PIKE ELECTRIC, LLC)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (TO PIKE ELECTRIC, LLC)

09/23/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (TO PIKE ELECTRIC, LLC)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, PIKE ELECTRIC

09/23/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, PIKE ELECTRIC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO COLE CONNER

09/23/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO COLE CONNER

NOTICE OF FILING THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

09/23/2022:NOTICE OF FILING THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES (TO COLE CONNER)

09/23/2022:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES (TO COLE CONNER)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (TO PIKE ELECTRIC, LLC)

09/23/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (TO PIKE ELECTRIC, LLC)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, PIKE ELECTRIC

09/23/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, PIKE ELECTRIC

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, COLE CONNER

10/11/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, COLE CONNER

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/11/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, COLE CONNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketJudge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number CC 216860

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, PIKE ELECTRIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (TO PIKE ELECTRIC, LLC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES (TO COLE CONNER)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO COLE CONNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, PIKE ELECTRIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (TO PIKE ELECTRIC, LLC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES (TO PIKE ELECTRIC, LLC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PIKE ELECTRIC, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketCase 122022CA000305CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less