This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 11/10/2019 at 15:01:02 (UTC).

BASS, ERNEST VS BASS, EMMA

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 BASS, ERNEST filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BASS, EMMA. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEAGLE, MARK E and MARK FEAGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEAGLE, MARK E

MARK FEAGLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BASS, ERNEST

Respondent

BASS, EMMA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • Event FH scheduled on 11/25/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Judge: FEAGLE , MARK E Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • RECEIPT FROM DAILY PAYMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number CC 159489

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Case 122019DR000677DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less