This case was last updated from Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court on 07/18/2020 at 20:02:21 (UTC).

BARSE, MICHAEL D VS ANDREWS, JEFFREY A Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 BARSE, MICHAEL D filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANDREWS, JEFFREY A. This case was filed in Columbia County - Third Judicial Circuit Court , Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEAGLE, MARK E and FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEAGLE, MARK E

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARSE, MICHAEL D

Defendants

ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY

TOUCHSTONE HEATING AND AIR INC

ANDREWS, JEFFREY A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLOTNICK, PHILIP JUDD

Defendant Attorney

FARHAT, MICHAEL ESSA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/24/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/24/2020:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JEFFREY A. ANDREWS

06/24/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JEFFREY A. ANDREWS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TOUCHSTONE HEATING AND AIR INC. C/O RICHARD TOUCHSTONE

06/24/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO TOUCHSTONE HEATING AND AIR INC. C/O RICHARD TOUCHSTONE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTERED AGENT CFO

06/24/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTERED AGENT CFO

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, JEFFREY A. ANDREWS

06/24/2020:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, JEFFREY A. ANDREWS

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, TOUCHSTONE HEATING AND AIR INC.

06/24/2020:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, TOUCHSTONE HEATING AND AIR INC.

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

06/24/2020:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

RETURN OF SERVICE- ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY C/O R/A CFO SERVED 06-29-20 (CORP-COLBY NUTTING, ADMINISTRATIVE SECRETARY)

06/30/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE- ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY C/O R/A CFO SERVED 06-29-20 (CORP-COLBY NUTTING, ADMINISTRATIVE SECRETARY)

RETURN OF SERVICE- TOUCHSTONE HEATING AND AIR INC. C/O RICHARD TOUCHSTONE SERVED 06-29-20 (CORP-KIM STIDHAM, OFFICE MANAGER)

06/30/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE- TOUCHSTONE HEATING AND AIR INC. C/O RICHARD TOUCHSTONE SERVED 06-29-20 (CORP-KIM STIDHAM, OFFICE MANAGER)

RETURN OF SERVICE- JEFFREY A. ANDREWS SERVED 06-30-20 (SUB-JOSH ANDREWS, CO-RESIDENT)

07/02/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE- JEFFREY A. ANDREWS SERVED 06-30-20 (SUB-JOSH ANDREWS, CO-RESIDENT)

DEFENSE COUNSEL'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516(b)(1)

07/08/2020:DEFENSE COUNSEL'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516(b)(1)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENSE COUNSEL'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516(b)(1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- JEFFREY A. ANDREWS SERVED 06-30-20 (SUB-JOSH ANDREWS, CO-RESIDENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- TOUCHSTONE HEATING AND AIR INC. C/O RICHARD TOUCHSTONE SERVED 06-29-20 (CORP-KIM STIDHAM, OFFICE MANAGER)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY C/O R/A CFO SERVED 06-29-20 (CORP-COLBY NUTTING, ADMINISTRATIVE SECRETARY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketJudge: FEAGLE , MARK E Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number CC 171666

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, TOUCHSTONE HEATING AND AIR INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, JEFFREY A. ANDREWS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, TOUCHSTONE HEATING AND AIR INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, JEFFREY A. ANDREWS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTERED AGENT CFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO TOUCHSTONE HEATING AND AIR INC. C/O RICHARD TOUCHSTONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JEFFREY A. ANDREWS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCase 122020CA000151CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/24/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Farhat, Michael Essa