This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/20/2019 at 22:01:33 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS CRUESS, RAYMOND G

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed an Other lawsuit against CRUESS, RAYMOND G. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

CRUESS, RAYMOND G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA, JORGE LUIS

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR RAYMOND G CRUESS ON 07/09/2019 SUB VALERIE CRUESS (SPOUSE)

07/11/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR RAYMOND G CRUESS ON 07/09/2019 SUB VALERIE CRUESS (SPOUSE)

NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

06/26/2019:NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO RAYMOND G CRUESS

06/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO RAYMOND G CRUESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • ANSWER FROM RAYMOND CRUESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR RAYMOND G CRUESS ON 07/09/2019 SUB VALERIE CRUESS (SPOUSE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Judge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO RAYMOND G CRUESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CC 153036

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Case 122019CC000871CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less