This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 07/19/2019 at 18:01:08 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS BAKER, KAYCEE M

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BAKER, KAYCEE M. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TOM COLEMAN and COLEMAN, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Columbia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Columbia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TOM COLEMAN

COLEMAN, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

BAKER, KAYCEE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALVAREZ, MELISSA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO KAYCEE M BAKER

06/25/2019:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO KAYCEE M BAKER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/25/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • Event SMCL Pretrial scheduled on 10/2/2019 at 0900 AM, M1 - Judge TOM COLEMAN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Judge: COLEMAN , TOM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO KAYCEE M BAKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number CC 152973

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Case 122019SC000864SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Event Date: 10/02/2019 09:00; Judge: COLEMAN, TOM; Docket Type: SMCL Pretrial; Location: M1 COURTROOM 1

    Read MoreRead Less