This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 09/19/2021 at 15:02:52 (UTC).

BAKER, TAMMY LEE VS JENKINS, RILEY TMOTHY

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 BAKER, TAMMY LEE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against JENKINS, RILEY TMOTHY. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN, PAUL BRYAN and BRYAN, PAUL S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN

PAUL BRYAN

BRYAN, PAUL S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BAKER, TAMMY LEE

Respondent

JENKINS, RILEY TMOTHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SAFKER, NICOLE CHRISTINA

Respondent Attorney

MORRISON, ADAM LUTHER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketORDER OF CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEvent INJUNCTION HEAR scheduled on 10/5/2021 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge PAUL BRYAN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event INJUNCTION HEAR on 9/14/2021 0900 AM Judge PAUL BRYAN results CONTINUED on 9/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO CONTINUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE / DUPLICATE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY LAW FIRM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION SERVED ON RESPONDENT 08/27/21 (INDV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketAMENDED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION SERVED ON RESPONDENT 08/31/21 (INDV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketEvent INJUNCTION HEAR scheduled on 9/14/2021 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge PAUL BRYAN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event INJUNCTION HEAR on 9/7/2021 0900 AM Judge PAUL BRYAN results CANCELLED on 8/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketAMENDED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketEvent INJUNCTION HEAR scheduled on 9/7/2021 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge PAUL BRYAN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCase 122021DR000206DVAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketJudge: BRYAN , PAUL S assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORRISON, ADAM LUTHER