This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County on 09/08/2021 at 05:45:37 (UTC).

AUDY, PHYLLIS BOSTON VS MCFARLAN, ELLIOTT GENE Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 AUDY, PHYLLIS BOSTON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MCFARLAN, ELLIOTT GENE. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND and DOUGLAS, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND

DOUGLAS, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUDY, PHYLLIS BOSTON

Defendants

MCFARLAN, ELLIOTT GENE

TIMMERMAN, BRIAN DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALI, AFFAN

Defendant Attorney

GAGNON, DAVID MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT, BRIAN TIMMERMAN'S, NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF, PHYLLIS BOSTON AUDY'S, FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

09/01/2021:DEFENDANT, BRIAN TIMMERMAN'S, NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF, PHYLLIS BOSTON AUDY'S, FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT, BRIAN DAVID TIMMERMAN'S, NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, PHYSLLIS BOSTON AUDY

08/27/2021:DEFENDANT, BRIAN DAVID TIMMERMAN'S, NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, PHYSLLIS BOSTON AUDY

RETURN OF SERVICE- ELLIOTT GENE MCFARLAN SERVED 05-27-21 (SUB-BRANDON LITTLE, SIL)

06/11/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE- ELLIOTT GENE MCFARLAN SERVED 05-27-21 (SUB-BRANDON LITTLE, SIL)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, ELLIOTT GENE MCFARLAN

05/14/2021:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, ELLIOTT GENE MCFARLAN

PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, ELLIOTT GENE MCFARLAN

05/14/2021:PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, ELLIOTT GENE MCFARLAN

DEFENDANTS, ELLIOTT MCFARLAN AND BRIAN TIMMERMAN'S, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/04/2021:DEFENDANTS, ELLIOTT MCFARLAN AND BRIAN TIMMERMAN'S, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR BRIAN DAVID TIMMERMAN SERVED 05/27/21 (INDV)

06/02/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE-FOR BRIAN DAVID TIMMERMAN SERVED 05/27/21 (INDV)

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, BRIAN DAVID TIMMERMAN

05/14/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, BRIAN DAVID TIMMERMAN

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, ELLIOTT GENE MCFARLAN

05/14/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, ELLIOTT GENE MCFARLAN

SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRIAN DAVID TIMMERMAN

05/14/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRIAN DAVID TIMMERMAN

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ELIOTT GENE MCFARLAN

05/14/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ELIOTT GENE MCFARLAN

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/14/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS, ELLIOTT MCFARLAN AND BRIAN TIMMERMAN'S, RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS, ELLIOTT MCFARLAN AND BRIAN TIMMERMAN'S, REESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, BRIAN TIMMERMAN'S, NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF, PHYLLIS BOSTON AUDY'S, FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS, ELLIOTT MCFARLAN AND BRIAN TIMMERMAN'S, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF, PHYLLIS BOSTON AUDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, BRIAN DAVID TIMMERMAN'S, NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, PHYSLLIS BOSTON AUDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFESNSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER WITH ATTACHED PLAN AND PROCEDURES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- ELLIOTT GENE MCFARLAN SERVED 05-27-21 (SUB-BRANDON LITTLE, SIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS, ELLIOTT MCFARLAN AND BRIAN TIMMERMAN'S, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS, ELLIOTT MCFARLAN AND BRIAN TIMMERMAN'S, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, BRIAN DAVID TIMMERMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, ELLIOTT GENE MCFARLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO BRIAN DAVID TIMMERMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ELIOTT GENE MCFARLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number CC 187866

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCase 122021CA000121CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gagnon, David Michael