This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County on 09/08/2021 at 05:58:49 (UTC).

ATKINS, TERRI VS JONES, JOHN A

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 ATKINS, TERRI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JONES, JOHN A. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Columbia County, Columbia County Courthouse located in Columbia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD and FEAGLE, MARK E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

FEAGLE, MARK E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATKINS, TERRI

Defendant

JONES, JOHN A

Not Classified By Court

JAKE JONES, JOHN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIBERT, ERIC ALAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE FOR TRIAL

08/04/2021:NOTICE FOR TRIAL

RETURN OF SERVICE- JOHN A. JONES AKA JOHN A. JAKE JONES SERVED 07/09/21 (SUB-KARI MASICH) (SERVED SUMMONS, COMPLAINT & 3RD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER)

07/15/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE- JOHN A. JONES AKA JOHN A. JAKE JONES SERVED 07/09/21 (SUB-KARI MASICH) (SERVED SUMMONS, COMPLAINT & 3RD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER)

RETURN OF SERVICE-JOHN A. JONES AKA JOHN A. JAKE JONES SERVED 07/09/21 (SUB-KARI MASICH)

07/13/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE-JOHN A. JONES AKA JOHN A. JAKE JONES SERVED 07/09/21 (SUB-KARI MASICH)

RETURN OF SERVICE-JOHN A. JONES SERVED 6-07-21 (INDV)

06/09/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE-JOHN A. JONES SERVED 6-07-21 (INDV)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOHN A. JONES A/K/A JOHN A. JAKE JONES

05/25/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOHN A. JONES A/K/A JOHN A. JAKE JONES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/25/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE- JOHN A. JONES AKA JOHN A. JAKE JONES SERVED 07/09/21 (SUB-KARI MASICH) (SERVED SUMMONS, COMPLAINT & 3RD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE-JOHN A. JONES AKA JOHN A. JAKE JONES SERVED 07/09/21 (SUB-KARI MASICH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketANSWER OF JOHN A. JONES AKA JOHN A. JAKE JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER WITH ATTACHED PLAN AND PROCEDURES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE-JOHN A. JONES SERVED 6-07-21 (INDV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketJudge: FEAGLE , MARK E Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $915.00 Receipt Number CC 188582

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $915.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JOHN A. JONES A/K/A JOHN A. JAKE JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $915.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCase 122021CA000129CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIBERT, ERIC ALAN