This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 08:59:51 (UTC).

WINKLER, MARTINA SYLVIA vs. SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY DBA SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 WINKLER, MARTINA SYLVIA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY DBA SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1378

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WINKLER, MARTINA SYLVIA

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY DBA SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CROSKEY, STEVEN

Defendant Attorney

BONFANI, MICHAEL J

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 1/15/2020 1:57 PM / RECEPTION #: 2020002647

1/14/2020: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 1/15/2020 1:57 PM / RECEPTION #: 2020002647

AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/29/2019: AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE/PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY

12/29/2019: NOTICE/PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND/OR MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

1/8/2020: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND/OR MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

AMENDED MOTION TO ABATE LITIGATION

1/8/2020: AMENDED MOTION TO ABATE LITIGATION

MOTION TO ABATE LITIGATION

12/23/2019: MOTION TO ABATE LITIGATION

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND/OR MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND AND/OR OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS

12/23/2019: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND/OR MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND AND/OR OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/16/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

EXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED - VIA CFO ELECTRONICALLY 12/6/19

12/6/2019: EXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED - VIA CFO ELECTRONICALLY 12/6/19

SUMMONS ISSUED - 20 DAY

12/4/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED - 20 DAY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/3/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

12/3/2019: DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

12/3/2019: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

12/3/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

12/3/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/3/2019: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 1/15/2020 1:57 PM / RECEPTION #: 2020002647

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND/OR MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketAMENDED MOTION TO ABATE LITIGATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2019
  • DocketNOTICE/PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2019
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO ABATE LITIGATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND/OR MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND AND/OR OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED - VIA CFO ELECTRONICALLY 12/6/19

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #12946

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCOUNTY CIVIL CLAIMS > $2,500 <= $15,000 ASSESSED $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/03/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CC001378

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bonfanti, Michael J