This case was last updated from Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/11/2023 at 07:03:08 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC vs. WILLIAMSON, NANCY JO

Case Summary

On 10/28/2022 WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WILLIAMSON, NANCY JO. This case was filed in Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1116

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC

Defendants

WILLIAMSON, NANCY JO

WILLIAMSON, HAROLD D

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBERG, ANNA JUDD

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/28/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 10/28/2022 2:40 PM / RECEPTION #: 2022064470

10/28/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 10/28/2022 2:40 PM / RECEPTION #: 2022064470

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

10/28/2022: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO NANCY JO WILLIAMSON

10/28/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO NANCY JO WILLIAMSON

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO HAROLD WILLIAMSON

10/28/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO HAROLD WILLIAMSON

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1

10/28/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2

10/28/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

10/28/2022: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

PAYMENT $945.00 RECEIPT #163433

10/28/2022: PAYMENT $945.00 RECEIPT #163433

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

10/28/2022: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY

12/5/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 12/13/2022 11:21 AM / RECEPTION #: 2022071926

12/12/2022: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 12/13/2022 11:21 AM / RECEPTION #: 2022071926

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/12/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

DEFAULT

12/12/2022: DEFAULT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 12/13/2022 11:21 AM / RECEPTION #: 2022071926

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING MILITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE; NON-SRVD SUMMONS ON UNKNOWN TENANT #2 ON 11/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE; NON-SRVD SUMMONS ON UNKNOWN TENANT #1 ON 11/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE; SUB SRVD SUMMONS ON HAROLD WILLIAMSON ON 11/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE; INDV SRVD SUMMONS ON NANCY JO WILLIAMSON ON 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO HAROLD WILLIAMSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO NANCY JO WILLIAMSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 10/28/2022 2:40 PM / RECEPTION #: 2022064470

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 10/28/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CA001116

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less