This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 08:47:25 (UTC).

VESTCOR FUND XVL, LTD AS MANAGER FOR HOLLY COVE AP vs PABLO IRIZARRY RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 09/18/2017 VESTCOR FUND XVL, LTD AS MANAGER FOR HOLLY COVE AP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PABLO IRIZARRY RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1634

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VESTCOR FUND XVL, LTD AS MANAGER FOR HOLLY COVE AP

Defendants

SAYLOR, TIFFANY

IRIZARRY RODRIGUEZ, PABLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WESTLING, SR., DALE G ESQ

 

Court Documents

Default issued from efile

10/9/2017: Default issued from efile

Default Proposed

10/6/2017: Default Proposed

Motion for Default and NonMilitary Affidavit

10/6/2017: Motion for Default and NonMilitary Affidavit

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service Plaintiff put in possession on 10.20.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: Writ of Possession Sent to CCSO w/ $90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketEntry: 10/11/2017 Final Judgment, Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Default issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Default Proposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Default and NonMilitary Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: Returned Mail as to Tiffany Saylor; Eviction Packet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: Count I eviction executed Posted Summons to Tiffany Saylor on 9.25.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: Count I eviction executed Posted Summons to Pablo Irizarry-Rodriguez on 9.25.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Mailing/Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: Eviction Summons Issued as to Tiffany Saylor; issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: Eviction Summons Issued as to Pablo Irizary-Rodriguez; issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint with Lease and 3 Day Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less