This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 08:29:21 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC vs. QUINONES, ANDRES

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against QUINONES, ANDRES. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1337

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants

SANCHEZ, ELIZABETH

QUINONES, ANDRES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SINGER, JONATHAN ROBERT

WEISSMAN, RICHARD ESQ

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS/VACATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOVES FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

1/20/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS/VACATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOVES FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

MOTION TO DISMISS/VACATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOVES FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

1/9/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS/VACATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOVES FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

12/4/2019: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #12058

11/26/2019: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #12058

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ANDRES QUINONES

11/26/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ANDRES QUINONES

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ELIZABETH SANCHEZ

11/26/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ELIZABETH SANCHEZ

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/26/2019: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/26/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/26/2019: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • HearingMotion to Dismiss; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Division C Chambers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 2/24/2020 @ 3:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS/VACATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOVES FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS/VACATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOVES FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketEXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED AS TO ELIZABETH SANCHEZ; SUBSERVED ON 12/30/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketEXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED - AS TO ANDRES QUINONES; INDIVIDUALLY SERVED 12/6/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #12058

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ANDRES QUINONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ELIZABETH SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCOUNTY CIVIL CLAIMS > $2,500 <= $15,000 ASSESSED $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/26/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CC001337

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISSMAN, RICHARD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Singer, Jonathan Robert, ESQ.