This case was last updated from Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/25/2022 at 19:23:34 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDI vs. CACV OF COLORADO LLC

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDI filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CACV OF COLORADO LLC. This case was filed in Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHARRIT, MICHAEL S., WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B. and FORECLOSURE, JUDICIAL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0394

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.

WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.

FORECLOSURE, JUDICIAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDI

Defendants

CACV OF COLORADO LLC

LENDMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC SUCCESSOR BY MERGE

WILCOX, PATRICIA S

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PATRICIA S WILCOX AKA PAT WILCOX

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

DUVAL HOME BUYERS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, SARA BETH

Defendant Attorney

WILKES, ALISA D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE; WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON 3.14.22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketEntry: REOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketEntry: ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #125850

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE REOPENED FOR REOPEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO PATRICIA S. WILCOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 5/13/2021 2:47 PM / RECEPTION #: 2021029881

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $975.00 RECEIPT #88974

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/13/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA000394

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DUVAL HOME BUYERS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CACV of Colorado LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LENDMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant