This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/10/2020 at 19:28:43 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs ZACHARY GORMAN

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ZACHARY GORMAN. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COX, ANGELA M. and FORECLOSURE, JUDICIAL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0289

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COX, ANGELA M.

FORECLOSURE, JUDICIAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

WATERVIEW RIDGE ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

MENKE, SHANNON E

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ZACHARY N GORMAN

GORMAN, ZACHARY N

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHANNON E MENKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, SARA BETH

Defendant Attorneys

ENGVALSON, KINLEY I ESQ

ENGVALSON, KINLEY

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT

1/23/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT

PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #18518

1/13/2020: PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #18518

PAYMENT $91,779.00 RECEIPT #17714

1/7/2020: PAYMENT $91,779.00 RECEIPT #17714

Clerks Cover Letter Re: $70 Electronic Sale Fee

7/17/2018: Clerks Cover Letter Re: $70 Electronic Sale Fee

Notice of Sale

6/28/2018: Notice of Sale

Motion for Default/Default

4/18/2018: Motion for Default/Default

Affidavit/Proof Of Indebtedness

4/18/2018: Affidavit/Proof Of Indebtedness

Affidavit /Return Service non-served Unknown Spouse of Zachary N. Gorman n/k/a Shannon Menke on 3/7/2018

3/16/2018: Affidavit /Return Service non-served Unknown Spouse of Zachary N. Gorman n/k/a Shannon Menke on 3/7/2018

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Tenant #2

3/21/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Tenant #2

PAYMENT $97,199.70 RECEIPT #18519

1/13/2020: PAYMENT $97,199.70 RECEIPT #18519

RECEIPT # 17714 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

1/13/2020: RECEIPT # 17714 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

PROOF OF PUBLICATION/NOTICE OF SALE

11/15/2019: PROOF OF PUBLICATION/NOTICE OF SALE

06/28/2018 Summary Final Judgment, Summary Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: LESTER, DON)

6/28/2018: 06/28/2018 Summary Final Judgment, Summary Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: LESTER, DON)

Notice of Dropping Party

4/18/2018: Notice of Dropping Party

Motion for Summary Judgment on Foreclosure and Taxation of Attorney's Fees and Costs

4/18/2018: Motion for Summary Judgment on Foreclosure and Taxation of Attorney's Fees and Costs

20 Day Summons Issued as to Zachary Gorman

3/21/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued as to Zachary Gorman

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Spouse of Zachary Gorman

3/21/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Spouse of Zachary Gorman

Civil Cover Sheet

3/20/2017: Civil Cover Sheet

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RETURNED MAIL AS TO SARA COLLINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: CHECK RELEASED FROM REGISTRY - DOC STAMPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2017CA000289, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS ZACHARY GORMAN WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKETS CRTA-1/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: CHECK REQUEST TO ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $97,199.70 RECEIPT #18519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT # 17714 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: Designation of Primary E-Mail Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Filing Certification of Note Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARA B COLLINS, ESQ