This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/14/2020 at 11:15:56 (UTC).

U.S. Bank National Association vs Mario Trujillo

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 U S Bank National Association filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Mario Trujillo. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B. and FORECLOSURE, JUDICIAL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0900

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.

FORECLOSURE, JUDICIAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

PARTNERS FOR PAYMENT RELIEF DE IV LLC

ASBURY DOWNS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

TRUJILLO, DANNA

TRUJILLO, MARIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EDWARDS, JIMMY

LACROIX, WILLNAE

 

Court Documents

Motion for Default/Default no proposed default attached

5/10/2019: Motion for Default/Default no proposed default attached

20 Day Summons Issued as to:Asbury Downs Homeowners Association Inc.

8/27/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to:Asbury Downs Homeowners Association Inc.

PAYMENT $0.70 RECEIPT #20654

1/28/2020: PAYMENT $0.70 RECEIPT #20654

CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

10/11/2019: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

10/11/2019: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2636

9/30/2019: PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2636

Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale

8/16/2019: Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale

Notice of Sale

7/31/2019: Notice of Sale

Affidavit/Proof Of Indebtedness

6/14/2019: Affidavit/Proof Of Indebtedness

Motion for Summary Judgment on Foreclosure

6/14/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment on Foreclosure

Default

5/16/2019: Default

Default proposed

5/10/2019: Default proposed

20 Day Summons Issued as to:Mario Trujillo

8/27/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to:Mario Trujillo

20 Day Summons Issued as to:Partners for Payment Relief DE IV, LLC

8/27/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to:Partners for Payment Relief DE IV, LLC

20 Day Summons Issued as to:Danna Trujillo

8/27/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to:Danna Trujillo

Complaint

8/24/2018: Complaint

Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

8/24/2018: Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

8/24/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $0.70 RECEIPT #20654

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketEntry: CHECK RELEASED FROM REGISTRY - DOC STAMPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2018CA000900, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS MARIO TRUJILLO WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKETS CRTA-10/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2018CA000900, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS MARIO TRUJILLO WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKETS CRTA-10/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketEntry: CHECK REQUEST TO ADMINISTRATION DOC STAMPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketEntry: FORECLSOURE SALES DOC STAMPS ASSESSED $0.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • HearingEvent: Real Auction Sale; Judge: FORECLOSURE, JUDICIAL; Location: Online; Result: SOLD PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Partners For Payment Relief DE III LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWARDS, JIMMY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LACROIX, WILLNAE