This case was last updated from Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/16/2022 at 16:02:47 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. CASTRO, GLORIA DAMARIS

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CASTRO, GLORIA DAMARIS. This case was filed in Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LESTER, DON H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0501

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LESTER, DON H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

CASTRO, GLORIA DAMARIS

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GLORIA DAMARIS CASTRO

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION C/O PRESIDENT, VICE PRESIDENT OR ANY OTHER O

JENNINGS POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN ESQ

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/19/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

5/19/2022: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED

5/19/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

5/19/2022: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED ON FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

5/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED ON FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

SUMMONS ISSUED ON GLORIA CASTRO

5/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED ON GLORIA CASTRO

SUMMONS ISSUED ON JENNINGS POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC

5/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED ON JENNINGS POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE

5/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE

PAYMENT $945.00 RECEIPT #139731

5/19/2022: PAYMENT $945.00 RECEIPT #139731

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

5/19/2022: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $945.00 RECEIPT #139731

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED ON JENNINGS POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED ON GLORIA CASTRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED ON FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SUBMITTING CERTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 5/20/2022 10:39 AM / RECEPTION #: 2022032264

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/19/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CA000501

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Housing Finance Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan