This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/11/2020 at 20:39:19 (UTC).

Two Creeks Owners Association Inc vs Reginald Brown, Jr.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 Two Creeks Owners Association Inc filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Reginald Brown, Jr. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COX, ANGELA M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0335

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COX, ANGELA M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TWO CREEKS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

BROWN, LA TONYA J

BROWN, REGINALD K JR

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLS, CHASE

 

Court Documents

Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded

3/30/2017: Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded

Final Judgment

8/18/2017: Final Judgment

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Tenant #2

3/31/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Tenant #2

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Tenant #1

3/31/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Tenant #1

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Reginald K. Brown, Jr.

3/31/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Reginald K. Brown, Jr.

20 Day Summons Issued as to: La Tonya J. Brown

3/31/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: La Tonya J. Brown

Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

3/30/2017: Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

3/30/2017: Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

3/30/2017: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketEntry: Miscellaneous Proposed Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketEntry: Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Tenant #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Tenant #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Reginald K. Brown, Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: La Tonya J. Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TWO CREEKS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant