This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 06:25:12 (UTC).

TD BANK USA NA AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET vs. RHODES, KRISTEN S

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 TD BANK USA NA AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RHODES, KRISTEN S. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2529

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA NA AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET

Defendant

RHODES, KRISTEN S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADAMS, ANSON A

 

Court Documents

EXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED INDV SRVD 1/2/2020

1/6/2020: EXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED INDV SRVD 1/2/2020

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #14947

12/17/2019: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #14947

ORDER PRE-TRIAL 120 DAYS TO PROVE SERVICE OR DISMISS WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER

12/11/2019: ORDER PRE-TRIAL 120 DAYS TO PROVE SERVICE OR DISMISS WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER

UNEXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED

12/11/2019: UNEXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/8/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • HearingSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Courtroom 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED INDV SRVD 1/2/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #14947

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO ADAMS, ANSON A REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019SC002529, TD BANK USA NA AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET VS. RHODES, KRISTEN S WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKETS ORDER-12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER PRE-TRIAL 120 DAYS TO PROVE SERVICE OR DISMISS WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNEXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • HearingSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Courtroom 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #10212

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCLAIMS MORE THAN $2500-LESS THAN $5,000 ASSESSED $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/08/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019SC002529

    Read MoreRead Less